|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 17/06/1939 | 1 day | Heavy | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 29/08/1940 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 21/02/1942 | 21/03/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number C1832 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/12/1944 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 15/12/1945 | 19/01/1946 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/01/1947 | 02/05/1947 | 93 days | General | Boiler number 2946 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/12/1948 | 02/02/1949 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64946 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/09/1951 | 30/10/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27590 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/02/1954 | 16/03/1954 | 35 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/03/1954 | 27/03/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/04/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/08/1956 | 29/09/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27578 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/04/1959 | 01/05/1959 | 22 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/06/1959 | 25/06/1959 | 13 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/06/1963 | Inverurie Works (Awaiting scrapping or shopping) | In Works: 42273, 45176, 61076, 61103, D8032. Shopped in four weeks ending 7th June : 64588, D362, D6155, 44960, 65930, 61404. Scrapped in same period: 64581, 65217/57/304, 64822, 65928; 64499, 65237. Being scrapped: 57617/31, 68346, 90077/575. Awaiting scrapping or shopping-64599/600, 64795, 64950/86. 64946 was waiting at Kittybrewster. | SLS/196307 |
20/07/1963 | Inverurie Works (Scrapped) | Shopped during six weeks ended 20th July: 42273, 45176, 61076/346/402, 64549, 65267/323/908/22/6, D5340, D6140/5/6. Scrapped in same period-57607, 64795/946/86, 65261, 67668, 68445/79. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/03/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1808 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1741 Allocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
17/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/06/1939. | ||
29/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1940. | ||
21/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1942. Dep: 21/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1832 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1944. | ||
15/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1945. Dep: 19/01/1946. | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4946 | ||
30/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1947. Dep: 02/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2946 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
27/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
29/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/12/1948. Dep: 02/02/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64946 |
||
29/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1951. Dep: 30/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27590 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/02/1954. Dep: 16/03/1954. | ||
22/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954. | ||
07/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/04/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. | ||
22/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1956. Dep: 29/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27578 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/08/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
10/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/04/1959. Dep: 01/05/1959. | ||
13/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/06/1959. Dep: 25/06/1959. | ||
27/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
17/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64946 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |