Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 151 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4663 Week
» 27169 Month
» 330359 Year
» 1551924 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1898 on 25/04/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4951   14/09/1946
British Railways 64951   23/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 25/04/1938 to Colwick (CLK)
Withdrawal Mon 14/03/1960 off Tilbury (33B)
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick (New) on 25/04/1938
DON Doncaster on 14/09/1946
35C Spital Bridge on 12/10/1952
33A Plaistow on 07/04/1957
33B Tilbury on 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn on 14/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 14/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
25/04/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4906)
16/03/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number E1350)
17/10/1942 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number E1353)
11/11/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4914)
14/09/1946 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8006)
25/03/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2138)
23/07/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2696)
06/08/1952 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27704)
15/11/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27712)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/01/1940 16/03/1940 68 days General
Boiler number E1350 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1942 17/10/1942 45 days General
Boiler number E1353 (Diagram 97)
 
Doncaster Works 07/05/1943 07/08/1943 93 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 29/08/1944 11/11/1944 75 days General
Boiler number 4914 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1945 23/06/1945 37 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 04/05/1946 14/09/1946 134 days General
Boiler number 8006 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4951
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1947 25/03/1947 64 days Heavy
Boiler number 2138 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1949 23/07/1949 78 days General
Boiler number 2696 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64951
 
Derby Works 09/06/1950 07/09/1950 91 days Heavy Intermediate  
Derby Works 20/06/1952 06/08/1952 48 days General
Boiler number 27704 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1955 15/11/1955 9 days General
Boiler number 27712 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 25/08/1957 12/09/1957 19 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/07/1950 Derby Works 42146 almost complete; UTA.56 complete and painted; UTA.57 nearly complete. First two sets of frames in position for order No. 4310. Nos. 404, 40411/6, 43364 in store near station, joined a fortnight later by 43342 an 43482. Fresh off Works: 47000, 2035, 43900/61 repainted with emblem; 42503, 43985, 44007, 44200, 47233, 58075, 58234 lettered L.M.S.; 40656, 40925, 41064/96, 42377/93 lined black, with emblem; 40671 'British Railways'; 42311 unlined. In Paint Shop 58054 (ex 1341) with emblem. For shops W/E 15/7/50: 434, 40535, 41051, 41168, 1889, 42351/3, 42406, 3101, 43690, 43892/98, 44112/72, 7342, 58224, 64722, 64951, 4969. Still in Works Yard at end of July: 22853, 3511, 41034, 43297, 43818, 58036, 58229 (condemned). 24/7/50: Ex Works: 2070 still lettered G.W.R. 64827 repainted with emblem; 64903, tender lettered L.N.E.R.; 42503 lettered L.M.S. 30/7/50: 42146, UTA.56/57, Order 4310 as on 13th. Nos. 12070/1 complete, 12072/3 almost complete; 10800 in Diesel shop; 41060 lined with 'British Railways' on tender; 41181 has tender unlined with emblem; 42340 lined black with emblem. SLS/195010
15/09/1950 Derby Works For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E.
New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station.
Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted).
SLS/195012

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/04/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1898
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Colwick (CLK)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
09/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1940. Dep: 16/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number E1350 (Diagram 97)
   
03/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number E1353 (Diagram 97)
   
07/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/05/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943.    
29/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4914 (Diagram 97)
   
18/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945.    
04/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8006 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4951
   
14/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
21/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/01/1947. Dep: 25/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2138 (Diagram 97)
   
07/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1949. Dep: 23/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2696 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64951
   
09/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/06/1950. Dep: 07/09/1950.    
20/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1952. Dep: 06/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27704 (Diagram 97)
   
12/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
07/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1955. Dep: 15/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27712 (Diagram 97)
   
07/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
25/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/08/1957. Dep: 12/09/1957.    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
14/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64951 from Tilbury (33B)    

prev prev