Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 97 Today
» 921 Yesterday
» 4566 Week
» 5456 Month
» 313437 Year
» 1197818 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1903   29/04/1938
LNER (1946) 4952   20/01/1946
BR (Tmp) E4952   20/01/1948
BR 64952   06/08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 29/04/1938 to Colwick (CLK)
Withdrawal Mon 14/03/1960 off Tilbury (33B)
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick (New) 29/04/1938
ARD Ardsley 31/03/1946
SHF Sheffield Darnall 28/07/1946
DON Doncaster 22/09/1946
33A Plaistow 02/06/1957
33B Tilbury 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn 14/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   14/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/04/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4907)
25/05/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4920)
13/03/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number E1354)
02/06/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2932)
20/01/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number RS118)
12/12/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27656)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 25/04/1940 25/05/1940 31 days General
Boiler number 4920 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1942 13/03/1943 84 days General
Boiler number E1354 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1945 02/06/1945 61 days General
Boiler number 2932 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1947 20/01/1948 88 days General
Boiler number RS118 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E4952
 
Derby Works 13/06/1951 06/08/1951 55 days Heavy Intermediate
Renumbered to BR 64952
 
Stratford Works 05/11/1953 12/12/1953 38 days General
Boiler number 27656 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1956 26/05/1956 38 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/04/1938 To Service To service as LNER Number 1903
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Colwick (CLK)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
25/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4920 (Diagram 97)
   
20/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1942. Dep: 13/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number E1354 (Diagram 97)
   
03/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2932 (Diagram 97)
   
20/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4952    
31/03/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
28/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
22/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1947. Dep: 20/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number RS118 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E4952
   
13/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/06/1951. Dep: 06/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64952
   
05/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1953. Dep: 12/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27656 (Diagram 97)
   
19/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/04/1956. Dep: 26/05/1956.    
02/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
14/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64952 from Tilbury (33B)    

prev prev