Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 822 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2937 Week
» 25443 Month
» 328633 Year
» 1550198 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1922 on 04/05/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4953 on 17/03/1946
British Railways 64953   21/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 04/05/1938 to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)
Withdrawal Mon 14/03/1960 off Tilbury (33B)
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe (New) on 04/05/1938
IPS Ipswich on 22/10/1941
STR Stratford on 02/07/1947
PKS Parkeston Quay on 18/01/1948
33A Plaistow on 26/05/1957
33B Tilbury on 30/10/1959
   Withdrawn on 14/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford on 02/07/1947
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 14/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/05/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4908)
10/08/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4912)
27/08/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1711)
30/06/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3199)
21/04/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4935)
12/03/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27822)
10/10/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27849)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 04/07/1940 10/08/1940 38 days General
Boiler number 27548 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 28/03/1943 27/08/1943 153 days General
Boiler number C1711 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 21/05/1944 01/07/1944 42 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 12/04/1945 30/06/1945 80 days General
Boiler number 3199 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 20/09/1945 17/10/1945 28 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 01/11/1946 22/11/1946 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 01/02/1948 21/04/1948 81 days General
Boiler number 4935 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64953
 
Derby Works 02/04/1951 05/06/1951 65 days Heavy Intermediate  
Stratford Works 08/02/1954 12/03/1954 33 days General
Boiler number 27822 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 31/08/1956 10/10/1956 41 days General
Boiler number 27849 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 16/04/1957 29/04/1957 14 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 08/10/1957 16/10/1957 9 days Light Casual
A.T.C. & Continuous blow-down fitted
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
24/04/1951 Derby Works On 24/4/1951 new 5MT 73001 was complete, 73002/3 had the boilers mounted on the frames, 73004 has frames only in position. New Diesel shunter 12088 was almost complete, 12089 frames only. In the works, the following interesting engines were in for repairs: (40)487, 41536, 47004. Additional engines stored near station are: (40)404, 40426, 43496. Two J39 class were in works : 64953/5. By 5/5/1951, 73002 was almost complete; in addition, 41005 was in works for special examination, 41020 for general repairs, 41844 also for special examination. 58865 was in the works yard covered with a tarpaulin, and 40462 an 22970 were nearby. SLS/195106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/05/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1922
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
04/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1940. Dep: 10/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27548 (Diagram 97)
   
22/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
28/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1943. Dep: 27/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1711 (Diagram 97)
   
21/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/05/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944.    
12/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1945. Dep: 30/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3199 (Diagram 97)
   
20/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1945. Dep: 17/10/1945.    
17/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4953    
01/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1946. Dep: 22/11/1946.    
02/07/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
01/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1948. Dep: 21/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4935 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64953
   
02/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/04/1951. Dep: 05/06/1951.    
08/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1954. Dep: 12/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27822 (Diagram 97)
   
31/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1956. Dep: 10/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27849 (Diagram 97)
   
16/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/04/1957. Dep: 29/04/1957.    
26/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
08/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1957. Dep: 16/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
A.T.C. & Continuous blow-down fitted
   
30/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
14/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64953 from Tilbury (33B)    

prev prev