Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 712 Today
» 1118 Yesterday
» 4348 Week
» 23993 Month
» 58635 Year
» 1280200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1926   06/05/1938
LNER (1946) 4954   07/07/1946
BR 64954   24/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Tue 06/05/1938 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Tue 15/03/1960 off Tilbury (33B)
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 06/05/1938
NWE New England 11/04/1942
GOR Gorton 18/06/1943
LIV Brunswick 06/04/1947
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 22/05/1950
9G Northwich 01/04/1951
35C Spital Bridge 12/10/1952
33A Plaistow 26/05/1957
33B Tilbury 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn 15/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIV Brunswick 06/04/1947
ALLOC 9G Northwich w/e 07/04/1951
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   15/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/05/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4909)
06/07/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4907)
13/11/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3177)
15/03/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1710)
09/11/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4979)
28/02/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27744)
05/05/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27739)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/06/1940 06/07/1940 32 days General
Boiler number 4907 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1943 13/11/1943 30 days General
Boiler number 3177 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1944 16/12/1944 27 days General  
Gorton Works 16/09/1947 15/03/1947 -184 days General  
Gorton Works 10/02/1948 26/04/1948 77 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 64954
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1949 09/11/1949 14 days General
Boiler number 4979 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 19/01/1953 28/02/1953 41 days General
Boiler number 27744 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1956 05/05/1956 51 days General
Boiler number 27739 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 26/09/1957 02/10/1957 7 days Light Casual
A.T.C. & Continuous blow-down fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/05/1938 To Service To service as LNER Number 1926
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
05/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4907 (Diagram 97)
   
11/04/1942 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
18/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
15/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1943. Dep: 13/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3177 (Diagram 97)
   
20/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1944. Dep: 16/12/1944.    
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4954    
15/03/1947 Modification Diagram 97 number C1710 boiler fitted    
06/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
16/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947.    
10/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1948. Dep: 26/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64954
   
27/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1949. Dep: 09/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4979 (Diagram 97)
   
22/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
01/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (9G)    
12/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
19/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27744 (Diagram 97)
   
16/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1956. Dep: 05/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27739 (Diagram 97)
   
26/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
26/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/09/1957. Dep: 02/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
A.T.C. & Continuous blow-down fitted
   
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
15/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64954 from Tilbury (33B)    

prev prev