Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 785 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2900 Week
» 25406 Month
» 328596 Year
» 1550161 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1928 on 14/05/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4956   22/09/1946
British Railways 64956   19/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Tue 14/05/1938 to Ipswich (IPS)
Withdrawal Tue 15/03/1960 off Tilbury (33B)
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IPS Ipswich (New) on 14/05/1938
MAR March on 11/05/1939
GRA Grantham on 12/05/1942
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 13/10/1946
36A Doncaster on 17/08/1952
33A Plaistow on 26/05/1957
33B Tilbury on 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn on 15/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 15/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
14/05/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2932)
11/11/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4915)
19/10/1950 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4991)
16/06/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27781)
24/11/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27776)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 01/09/1940 19/10/1940 49 days General  
Cowlairs Works 11/03/1943 27/06/1943 109 days General  
Gorton Works 12/09/1944 11/11/1944 61 days General
Boiler number 4915 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1945 12/01/1946 84 days General  
Gorton Works 08/06/1947 01/08/1947 55 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 24/09/1947 20/04/1947 -156 days General  
Derby Works 12/08/1950 19/10/1950 69 days General
Boiler number 4991 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64956
 
Stratford Works 04/05/1953 16/06/1953 44 days General
Boiler number 27781 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1956 24/11/1956 0 General  
Stratford Works 26/09/1957 02/10/1957 7 days Light Casual
A.T.C. & Continuous blow-down fitted
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1950 Derby Works For works: 12000, 40012/51/8, 40353, 414, 40498, 40515, 527, 40567, 684, 40917/26/8, 41017/58/72/7/81, 41124/60/9, 41710, 1748, 41961, 42508/15, 3099, 43216/24, 3271, 43283, 3484, 43538, 3738/59/60, 43835/54/62, 43909/16/29/94, 44020/45/94/6, 44137, 44414/33/75, 44566, 47220, 7237, 47287, 7324, 47356, 7395, 7403/5/17/51, 47506, 7507,7542/81, 58033, 1406, 58080, 58224, W.2108 and 'J.39' 4721/37/85, 64980, 4956. Ex Works: 42146, UTA.57, 12070-3 (new): and after repair 40410, 40535/56, 40929, 41088, 41535, 41672, 41752, 41889, 42353, 42510, 43224, 43446, 43574, 43690, 44127/37/90, 44242, 44362, 44414/72, 44521, 47280, 47342/56/65, 47426, 47526, 58220/4/9, 64762/84/97, 64960 and 2097. New Construction, in various stages 2-6-4T 42050-4 (Order 4310) and D/E 12074/5 almost complete. Being cut up 41034, 58036 (24/8). The works yard contained 22853, 43818, 43297, 41017, 3511, 40515 (all condemned) and 58033, 1406, 40498 (under consideration). SLS/195012
21/10/1950 Derby Works For Works: W/E 21/10/50, 40405 5C, 40505 71H, 40522 8E, 40743 20A, 41123 7A, 42184 16A, 42332 9B, 42374 33A, 42521 33D, 43212 18C, 44166 17B, 4267 22A, 44524 21A, 7096 1A, 7441 15C, 47469 23C, 20155 16A, 23006 3E, 58247 17C, (W) 2107 84F, 64834 32B, 64958 30A. The most interesting items are 40743 for intermediate repair, and 20155 (the last 2-4-0-Midland-for special examination which usually means condemnation).
New construction: 42054 on trials 18/10, 42055/6 completed, 42057-60 in various stages; 12078 in paint shop 18/10, 12079-81 complete, 12082-4 in various stages.
Ex works 40532/655, 41004/67, 42509/22, 42325, 47410, 64721/37/57, 64956/80 (W/E 18/10), 40584, 41001/60, 41153/65/81, 41833, 42345, 43586, 43992, 47340, 47674, 64883 (W/E 25/10).
Cut up: 15-18/10/50. Nos. 1251 an 1406 (old Nos.). No. 58236, in paint shop 18/10 with R/T boiler.
Stored: 407, 40418/513/556/632, 43342/64, 3368, 43482, 43200. (25/10).
SLS/195012

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/05/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1928
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Ipswich (IPS)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
11/05/1939 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
01/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940.    
12/05/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
11/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1943. Dep: 27/06/1943.    
12/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4915 (Diagram 97)
   
21/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946.    
22/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4956    
13/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
08/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/06/1947. Dep: 01/08/1947.    
24/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1947. Dep: 20/04/1947.    
12/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1950. Dep: 19/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4991 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64956
   
17/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
04/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1953. Dep: 16/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27781 (Diagram 97)
   
24/11/1956 Modification Diagram 97 number 27776 boiler fitted    
25/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1956. Dep: 24/11/1956.    
26/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
26/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/09/1957. Dep: 02/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
A.T.C. & Continuous blow-down fitted
   
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
15/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64956 from Tilbury (33B)    

prev prev