|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/07/1940 | 31/08/1940 | 38 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1942 | 16/01/1943 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 09/05/1944 | 30/06/1944 | 53 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 02/02/1945 | 03/02/1945 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1945 | 11/08/1945 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 2222 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/08/1948 | 30/09/1948 | 39 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64957 |
||
Stratford Works | 30/09/1948 | 16/01/1948 | -257 days | General | |||
Derby Works | 10/02/1951 | 09/04/1951 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 27801 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 15/11/1951 | 02/01/1952 | 49 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 27/01/1953 | 27/03/1953 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 27747 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 30/08/1955 | 08/10/1955 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27714 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/10/1957 | 16/10/1957 | 9 days | Light Casual | A.T.C. & Continuous blow-down fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 21/10/1957 | 23/10/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/05/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1930 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1753 Allocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
28/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1940. Dep: 31/08/1940. | ||
09/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1942. Dep: 16/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
09/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/05/1944. Dep: 30/06/1944. | ||
07/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
02/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1945. Dep: 03/02/1945. | ||
04/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2222 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4957 | ||
07/11/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
23/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/08/1948. Dep: 30/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64957 |
||
30/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1948. Dep: 16/01/1948. | ||
10/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1951. Dep: 09/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27801 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1951. Dep: 02/01/1952. | ||
27/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1953. Dep: 27/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27747 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27714 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) | ||
08/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1957. Dep: 16/10/1957. Work undertaken: A.T.C. & Continuous blow-down fitted |
||
21/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1957. Dep: 23/10/1957. | ||
31/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) | ||
03/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
14/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64957 from Tilbury (33B) |