Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 195 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5949 Week
» 33907 Month
» 68549 Year
» 1290114 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1930   14/05/1938
LNER (1946) 4957   17/03/1946
BR 64957   30/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 14/05/1938 to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)
Withdrawal Mon 14/03/1960 off Tilbury (33B)
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 21 yrs , 10 mths

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend (New) 14/05/1938
DON Doncaster 28/02/1940
STR Stratford 05/09/1943
NOR Norwich Thorpe 07/09/1944
IPS Ipswich 07/11/1946
33A Plaistow 26/05/1957
33B Tilbury 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn 14/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 09/11/1946
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   14/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
14/05/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4910)
16/01/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3211)
11/08/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2222)
09/04/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27801)
27/03/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27747)
08/10/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27714)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 25/07/1940 31/08/1940 38 days General  
Gorton Works 09/11/1942 16/01/1943 69 days General
Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 09/05/1944 30/06/1944 53 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 02/02/1945 03/02/1945 2 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 04/06/1945 11/08/1945 69 days General
Boiler number 2222 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 23/08/1948 30/09/1948 39 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 64957
 
Stratford Works 30/09/1948 16/01/1948 -257 days General  
Derby Works 10/02/1951 09/04/1951 59 days General
Boiler number 27801 (Diagram 97)
 
Derby Works 15/11/1951 02/01/1952 49 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 27/01/1953 27/03/1953 60 days General
Boiler number 27747 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 30/08/1955 08/10/1955 40 days General
Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 08/10/1957 16/10/1957 9 days Light Casual
A.T.C. & Continuous blow-down fitted
 
Stratford Works 21/10/1957 23/10/1957 3 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/05/1938 To Service To service as LNER Number 1930
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
28/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1940. Dep: 31/08/1940.    
09/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1942. Dep: 16/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 97)
   
05/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
09/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/05/1944. Dep: 30/06/1944.    
07/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
02/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1945. Dep: 03/02/1945.    
04/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2222 (Diagram 97)
   
17/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4957    
07/11/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
23/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/08/1948. Dep: 30/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64957
   
30/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1948. Dep: 16/01/1948.    
10/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1951. Dep: 09/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27801 (Diagram 97)
   
15/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1951. Dep: 02/01/1952.    
27/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1953. Dep: 27/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27747 (Diagram 97)
   
30/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 97)
   
26/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
08/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1957. Dep: 16/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
A.T.C. & Continuous blow-down fitted
   
21/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1957. Dep: 23/10/1957.    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
14/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64957 from Tilbury (33B)    

prev prev