Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1933   31/05/1938
LNER (1946) 4958   08/09/1946
BR 64958   15/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 31/05/1938 to Stratford (STR)
Withdrawal Mon 14/03/1960 off Tilbury (33B)
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford (New) 31/05/1938
IPS Ipswich 11/12/1940
30A Stratford 14/10/1951
31A Cambridge 25/09/1955
33A Plaistow 08/06/1958
33B Tilbury 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn 14/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 20/10/1951
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   14/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
31/05/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 491)
12/10/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number E1355)
26/06/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2102)
26/10/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2205)
15/04/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4934)
04/06/1952 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27433)
26/03/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27678)
30/11/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 25827)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 24/08/1940 12/10/1940 50 days General
Boiler number E1355 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 07/03/1943 26/06/1943 112 days General
Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 08/09/1945 26/10/1945 49 days General
Boiler number 2205 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 29/09/1946 12/11/1946 45 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 10/04/1947 19/05/1947 40 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 15/02/1948 15/04/1948 61 days General
Boiler number 4934 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64958
 
Derby Works 06/10/1950 01/12/1950 57 days Light Intermediate  
Derby Works 21/04/1952 04/06/1952 45 days General
Boiler number 27433 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 11/02/1955 26/03/1955 44 days General
Boiler number 27678 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 29/10/1957 30/11/1957 33 days General
Boiler number 25827 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 11/08/1958 14/08/1958 4 days Light Casual
Continuous blow-down fitted
 
Bow Works 16/12/1958 19/12/1958 4 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 10/08/1959 19/08/1959 10 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/05/1938 To Service To service as LNER Number 1933
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Stratford (STR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
24/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number E1355 (Diagram 97)
   
11/12/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
07/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97)
   
08/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1945. Dep: 26/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2205 (Diagram 97)
   
08/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4958    
29/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/09/1946. Dep: 12/11/1946.    
10/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/04/1947. Dep: 19/05/1947.    
15/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1948. Dep: 15/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4934 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64958
   
06/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 06/10/1950. Dep: 01/12/1950.    
14/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
21/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1952. Dep: 04/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27433 (Diagram 97)
   
11/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27678 (Diagram 97)
   
25/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
29/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1957. Dep: 30/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 25827 (Diagram 97)
   
08/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
11/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1958. Dep: 14/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Continuous blow-down fitted
   
16/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Bow Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/12/1958. Dep: 19/12/1958.    
10/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/08/1959. Dep: 19/08/1959.    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
14/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64958 from Tilbury (33B)    

prev prev