|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/10/1940 | 23/11/1940 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 4919 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1943 | 29/01/1944 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/02/1947 | 10/07/1947 | 160 days | General | Boiler number 2299 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 15/05/1950 | 19/07/1950 | 66 days | General | Boiler number C2032 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 31/07/1950 | 07/08/1950 | 8 days | Unclassified | For painting only |
||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1953 | 04/04/1953 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27751 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1955 | 21/01/1956 | 110 days | General | Boiler number 27752 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1957 | 28/12/1957 | 24 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 27662 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/01/1958 | 09/01/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1950 | Derby Works | For works: 12000, 40012/51/8, 40353, 414, 40498, 40515, 527, 40567, 684, 40917/26/8, 41017/58/72/7/81, 41124/60/9, 41710, 1748, 41961, 42508/15, 3099, 43216/24, 3271, 43283, 3484, 43538, 3738/59/60, 43835/54/62, 43909/16/29/94, 44020/45/94/6, 44137, 44414/33/75, 44566, 47220, 7237, 47287, 7324, 47356, 7395, 7403/5/17/51, 47506, 7507,7542/81, 58033, 1406, 58080, 58224, W.2108 and 'J.39' 4721/37/85, 64980, 4956. Ex Works: 42146, UTA.57, 12070-3 (new): and after repair 40410, 40535/56, 40929, 41088, 41535, 41672, 41752, 41889, 42353, 42510, 43224, 43446, 43574, 43690, 44127/37/90, 44242, 44362, 44414/72, 44521, 47280, 47342/56/65, 47426, 47526, 58220/4/9, 64762/84/97, 64960 and 2097. New Construction, in various stages 2-6-4T 42050-4 (Order 4310) and D/E 12074/5 almost complete. Being cut up 41034, 58036 (24/8). The works yard contained 22853, 43818, 43297, 41017, 3511, 40515 (all condemned) and 58033, 1406, 40498 (under consideration). | SLS/195012 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/06/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1942 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1757 Allocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
12/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
11/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4919 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1943. Dep: 29/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4960 | ||
01/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1947. Dep: 10/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2299 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1950. Dep: 19/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number C2032 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/07/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64960 | ||
31/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/07/1950. Dep: 07/08/1950. Work undertaken: For painting only |
||
19/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1953. Dep: 04/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27751 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
04/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1955. Dep: 21/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27752 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/12/1957. Dep: 28/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27662 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1958. Dep: 09/01/1958. | ||
09/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
07/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
01/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64960 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
28/02/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |