Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 621 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2736 Week
» 25242 Month
» 328432 Year
» 1549997 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1952 on 15/06/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4962   29/06/1946
British Railways 64962   11/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Wed 15/06/1938 to Ardsley (ARD)
Withdrawal Wed 16/03/1960 off Tilbury (33B)
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ARD Ardsley (New) on 15/06/1938
NWE New England on 23/02/1940
STR Stratford on 24/06/1940
DON Doncaster on 04/07/1940
NWE New England on 11/04/1942
GOR Gorton on 08/06/1943
39B Sheffield Darnall on 08/04/1951
30A Stratford on 19/05/1957
33A Plaistow on 08/06/1958
33B Tilbury on 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn on 16/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall w/e 14/04/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 16/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
15/06/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2766)
28/12/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8009)
15/04/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2146)
05/05/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8006)
11/12/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number E1354)
06/06/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27760)
03/03/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27717)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 31/10/1940 28/12/1940 59 days General
Boiler number 8009 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1944 15/04/1944 77 days General
Boiler number 2146 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1946 05/05/1947 137 days General
Boiler number 8006 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1947 02/06/1947 20 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 07/11/1948 11/12/1948 35 days General
Boiler number E1354 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64962
 
Derby Works 10/06/1950 07/09/1950 90 days Light Intermediate  
Derby Works 11/09/1950 05/10/1950 25 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 11/04/1953 06/06/1953 57 days General
Boiler number 27760 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1956 03/03/1956 46 days General
Boiler number 27717 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 01/09/1958 03/09/1958 3 days Light Casual
Spark arrestor & continuous blow-down fitted
 
Stratford Works 15/12/1958 17/12/1958 3 days Unclassified  
Bow Works 01/01/1959 12/01/1959 12 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/07/1950 Derby Works Engines into works: 1672, 41903, 42310, 3361, 43446, 4007, 44024, 44190, 44230, 44362, 4521, 7233, 47256, 7280, 7365, 12068, 53802, 53804, 58036. 58234, 64765, 64962, 2097. SLS/195008
15/09/1950 Derby Works For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E.
New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station.
Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted).
SLS/195012
14/10/1950 Derby Works For Works: W/E 14/10/50:-40585 27A, 40910 9E, 41057 17A, 41060 17A, 41080 20E, 1846 16A, 42301 11D, 42414 25B, 3058 (58204) 19C, 3274 9D, 43615 8B, 43885 18B, 43911 21A, 44408 16A, 44599 17B, 45594 19B. New Construction: 12077 in Paint Shop and 12078-80 complete on 9/10; 42052 on trials 29/9 and 42053 9/10; 42054/5 complete, 42056 almost complete and frames for next two down, 9/10; frames for the next diesel (d12081) are also laid down. Ex Works: 41062, 41154, 43914, 44598, 64980, 58209, 64962, 40351, 41068, 41006, 47548, 42353, 43456, 47481. No. 10800 was on test run on 29/9, and 10800 was standing outside the diesel shop on 9/10. SLS/195012

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/06/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1952
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Ardsley (ARD)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
23/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
24/06/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
04/07/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
31/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1940. Dep: 28/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8009 (Diagram 97)
   
11/04/1942 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
08/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1944. Dep: 15/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2146 (Diagram 97)
   
29/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4962    
20/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1946. Dep: 05/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8006 (Diagram 97)
   
14/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1947. Dep: 02/06/1947.    
07/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1948. Dep: 11/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number E1354 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64962
   
10/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/06/1950. Dep: 07/09/1950.    
11/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1950. Dep: 05/10/1950.    
08/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
11/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1953. Dep: 06/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27760 (Diagram 97)
   
18/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1956. Dep: 03/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27717 (Diagram 97)
   
19/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
01/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1958. Dep: 03/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Spark arrestor & continuous blow-down fitted
   
15/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/12/1958. Dep: 17/12/1958.    
01/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Bow Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/01/1959. Dep: 12/01/1959.    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
16/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64962 from Tilbury (33B)    

prev prev