|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1941 | 16/11/1941 | 10 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 23/06/1944 | 18/07/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 20/10/1945 | 09/11/1945 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 03/02/1947 | 23/05/1947 | 110 days | General | Boiler number 8007 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/04/1950 | 10/06/1950 | 47 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64963 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/12/1951 | 24/01/1952 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27468 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1955 | 30/06/1955 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/07/1955 | 12/07/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/01/1957 | 02/03/1957 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27596 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/04/1962 | Inverurie Works (Awaiting cut up) | In shops-44322/28, 45009, 64572, 64606, 65905. Awaiting shops: 65479. Shopped in previous five weeks-64552/91, 64602/27, 65297. Cut up previous five weeks- 55165/229, 57559, 61996/8, 64542/53, 65296, 68338. Being cut up: 40645/7, 57411, 57557, 64628. Awaiting cut up: 57560, 64566, 64963. 64553 was involved in an accident which resulted in a large 'tear' along the frame and although there was a possibility of repair it was scrapped in the shops. The battery rail-car is back in shops after further trials. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/06/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1965 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1760 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
19/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
07/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1941. Dep: 16/11/1941. | ||
09/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
25/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
23/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1944. Dep: 18/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8023 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/10/1945. Dep: 09/11/1945. | ||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4963 | ||
03/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1947. Dep: 23/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8007 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
22/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
27/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
25/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 25/04/1950. Dep: 10/06/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64963 |
||
12/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1951. Dep: 24/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27468 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/05/1955. Dep: 30/06/1955. | ||
11/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1955. Dep: 12/07/1955. | ||
24/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1957. Dep: 02/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27596 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/08/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
06/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
29/01/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64963 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
05/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |