|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/08/1940 | 27/08/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number E1353 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1941 | 27/12/1941 | 10 days | General | Boiler number 27770 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/01/1943 | 08/02/1943 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 28/04/1944 | 13/05/1944 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 2191 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 11/05/1946 | 17/06/1946 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/08/1948 | 01/09/1948 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2129 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64964 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/10/1948 | 28/10/1948 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/06/1950 | 05/08/1950 | 44 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/02/1953 | 21/03/1953 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 27467 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/02/1955 | 21/03/1955 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/06/1957 | 06/07/1957 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27518 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/05/1958 | 12/06/1958 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/09/1959 | 09/10/1959 | 29 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. | SLS/195008 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/06/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1971 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1762 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
01/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
20/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1940. Dep: 27/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number E1353 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1941. Dep: 27/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27770 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/01/1943. Dep: 08/02/1943. | ||
28/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1944. Dep: 13/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2191 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 17/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4964 | ||
08/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
10/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1948. Dep: 01/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2129 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64964 |
||
18/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/10/1948. Dep: 28/10/1948. | ||
23/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1950. Dep: 05/08/1950. | ||
27/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1953. Dep: 21/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27467 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/02/1955. Dep: 21/03/1955. | ||
03/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27518 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/05/1958. Dep: 12/06/1958. | ||
11/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/09/1959. Dep: 09/10/1959. | ||
24/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64964 from Carlisle Canal (12C) | ||
11/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |