Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 170 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5924 Week
» 33882 Month
» 68524 Year
» 1290089 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1974   02/07/1938
LNER (1946) 4965   23/09/1946
BR 64965   09/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 02/07/1938 to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)
Withdrawal Mon 14/03/1960 off Tilbury (33B)
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 21 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe (New) 02/07/1938
MAR March 23/06/1939
NOR Norwich Thorpe 04/09/1939
MAR March 13/10/1939
GRA Grantham 30/04/1942
NWE New England 09/02/1947
38A Colwick 26/03/1950
35C Spital Bridge 12/10/1952
33A Plaistow 29/06/1958
33B Tilbury 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn 14/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NWE New England 09/02/1947
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 14/07/1958
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   14/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/07/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4916)
30/11/1940 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4913)
24/07/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4906)
27/08/1947 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3197)
12/04/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27802)
07/11/1953 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27660)
20/06/1958 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27847)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/10/1940 30/11/1940 54 days General
Boiler number 4913 (Diagram 97)
 
Doncaster Works 16/08/1941 22/11/1941 99 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 14/05/1943 24/07/1943 72 days General
Boiler number 4906 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1947 27/08/1947 225 days General
Boiler number 3197 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1949 09/06/1949 30 days Heavy Casual
Renumbered to BR 64965
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1950 18/03/1950 49 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 22/03/1950 24/03/1950 3 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 22/02/1951 12/04/1951 50 days General
Boiler number 27802 (Diagram 97)
 
Derby Works 18/12/1951 01/02/1952 46 days Light Casual  
Stratford Works 12/10/1953 07/11/1953 27 days General
Boiler number 27660 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1956 19/05/1956 74 days General  
Stratford Works 12/05/1958 20/06/1958 40 days General
Boiler number 27847 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 18/08/1958 20/08/1958 3 days Light Casual
Spark arrestor & continuous blow-down fitted
 
Stratford Works 30/12/1958 31/12/1958 2 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 31/12/1958 06/01/1959 7 days Unclassified  
Bow Works 21/01/1959 27/01/1959 7 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/07/1938 To Service To service as LNER Number 1974
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
23/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
04/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
13/10/1939 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
08/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4913 (Diagram 97)
   
16/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/08/1941. Dep: 22/11/1941.    
30/04/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
14/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4906 (Diagram 97)
   
23/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4965    
15/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1947. Dep: 27/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3197 (Diagram 97)
   
09/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
11/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1949. Dep: 09/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64965
   
29/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1950. Dep: 18/03/1950.    
22/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1950. Dep: 24/03/1950.    
26/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
22/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1951. Dep: 12/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27802 (Diagram 97)
   
18/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/12/1951. Dep: 01/02/1952.    
12/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
12/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1953. Dep: 07/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27660 (Diagram 97)
   
07/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1956. Dep: 19/05/1956.    
12/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1958. Dep: 20/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27847 (Diagram 97)
   
29/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
18/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/08/1958. Dep: 20/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Spark arrestor & continuous blow-down fitted
   
30/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/12/1958. Dep: 31/12/1958.    
31/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/12/1958. Dep: 06/01/1959.    
21/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Bow Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/01/1959. Dep: 27/01/1959.    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
14/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64965 from Tilbury (33B)    

prev prev