|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1941 | 19/07/1941 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1942 | 12/12/1942 | 68 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1943 | 22/01/1944 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 4917 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1946 | 18/04/1946 | 86 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4967 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1947 | 15/10/1947 | 263 days | General | Boiler number 4908 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1948 | 26/07/1948 | 82 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64967 |
||
Derby Works | 17/12/1950 | 06/02/1951 | 52 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/05/1952 | 30/05/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 06/04/1953 | 30/05/1953 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 27779 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1955 | 21/01/1956 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 27735 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/01/1951 | Derby Works | During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. | SLS/195102 |
28/02/1951 | Derby Works | During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned. At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic. |
SLS/195104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/07/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1980 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1765 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
10/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1941. Dep: 19/07/1941. | ||
02/12/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
06/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/10/1942. Dep: 12/12/1942. | ||
17/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4917 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
30/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1946. Dep: 18/04/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4967 |
||
26/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1947. Dep: 15/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4908 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/05/1948. Dep: 26/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64967 |
||
17/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/12/1950. Dep: 06/02/1951. | ||
29/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/05/1952. Dep: 30/05/1952. | ||
06/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27779 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1955. Dep: 21/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27735 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64967 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
03/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |