Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 489 Today
» 1118 Yesterday
» 4125 Week
» 23770 Month
» 58412 Year
» 1279977 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1984   28/07/1938
LNER (1946) 4968   07/06/1946
BR 64968   08/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Wed 28/07/1938 to Stratford (STR)
Withdrawal Wed 16/03/1960 off Tilbury (33B)
Scrapping During 04/1960
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford (New) 28/07/1938
IPS Ipswich 06/09/1944
LOW Lowestoft 22/09/1946
NOR Norwich Thorpe 26/03/1947
32B Ipswich 14/06/1953
32A Norwich Thorpe 07/10/1953
32G Melton Constable 12/05/1957
32A Norwich Thorpe 28/07/1957
33A Plaistow 08/06/1958
33B Tilbury 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn 16/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 26/03/1947
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 32G Melton Constable 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   16/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/07/1938 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4919)
04/09/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1718)
08/06/1946 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2191)
08/01/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2317)
22/01/1952 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27692)
06/11/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27706)
22/02/1957 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27821)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 14/09/1940 02/11/1940 50 days General
Boiler number 4911 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 14/03/1943 04/09/1943 175 days General
Boiler number C1718 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 25/03/1944 05/04/1944 12 days Light Repair  
Stratford Works 04/04/1946 08/06/1946 66 days General
Boiler number 2191 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4968
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1948 08/01/1949 56 days General
Boiler number 2317 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64968
 
Derby Works 15/11/1951 22/01/1952 69 days General
Boiler number 27692 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 05/10/1954 06/11/1954 33 days General
Boiler number 3168 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 15/01/1957 22/02/1957 39 days General
Boiler number 27821 (Diagram 97)
 
Stratford Works 18/08/1958 20/08/1958 3 days Light Casual
Continuous blow-down fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/07/1938 To Service To service as LNER Number 1984
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Stratford (STR)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
14/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1940. Dep: 02/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4911 (Diagram 97)
   
14/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1718 (Diagram 97)
   
25/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/03/1944. Dep: 05/04/1944.    
06/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
04/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1946. Dep: 08/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2191 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4968
   
22/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
26/03/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
14/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2317 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64968
   
15/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1951. Dep: 22/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27692 (Diagram 97)
   
14/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
07/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
05/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3168 (Diagram 97)
   
15/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1957. Dep: 22/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27821 (Diagram 97)
   
12/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
28/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
08/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
18/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/08/1958. Dep: 20/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Continuous blow-down fitted
   
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
16/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64968 from Tilbury (33B)    

prev prev