|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/02/1944 | 04/04/1944 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2617 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 05/02/1946 | 13/04/1946 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 2113 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4972 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1947 | 22/11/1947 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1948 | 09/06/1948 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64972 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1949 | 18/02/1950 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 27729 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1950 | 02/03/1950 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 01/10/1952 | 10/11/1952 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1955 | 12/03/1955 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 27834 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1957 | 1 day | W |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/02/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3082 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1850 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
30/03/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
26/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1944. Dep: 04/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2617 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2113 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4972 |
||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/11/1947. Dep: 22/11/1947. | ||
11/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1948. Dep: 09/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64972 |
||
12/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1949. Dep: 18/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27729 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/02/1950. Dep: 02/03/1950. | ||
08/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
23/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
01/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/10/1952. Dep: 10/11/1952. | ||
10/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1955. Dep: 12/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27834 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/12/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
19/09/1957 | Works Visit | |||
11/12/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64972 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
01/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |