Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 636 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2751 Week
» 25257 Month
» 328447 Year
» 1550012 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3085 on 17/03/1941
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4975   22/06/1946
British Railways 64975   17/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Sat 17/03/1941 to St Margarets (STM)
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Dawsholm (65D)
Scrapping During 11/1963
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to G.H. Campbell, Airdrie

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STM St Margarets (New) on 17/03/1941
CAR Carlisle Canal on 20/08/1945
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill on 16/10/1947
64A St Margarets on 13/03/1959
65D Dawsholm on 29/08/1960
   Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill on 16/10/1947
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 24/04/1948
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 14/03/1959
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 24/09/1960
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
18/09/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4909)
08/08/1954 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27556)
24/04/1959 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 25805)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Cowlairs Works 02/08/1943 18/09/1943 48 days General
Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 18/09/1945 12/10/1945 25 days General  
Darlington Works 31/10/1945 24/11/1945 25 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 27/11/1945 08/12/1945 12 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 02/03/1946 09/03/1946 8 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 04/09/1948 17/09/1948 14 days General
Boiler number 27553 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64975
 
Inverurie Works 05/12/1951 28/12/1951 24 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 15/06/1954 08/08/1954 55 days General
Boiler number 27556 (Diagram 97)
 
Inverurie Works 19/07/1955 26/08/1955 39 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 12/11/1955 03/12/1955 22 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 04/04/1959 24/04/1959 21 days General
Boiler number 25805 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 06/11/1959 25/11/1959 20 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Vickers Armstrong Works Class '8' W.D. 2-8-0's awaiting repair at Vickers-Armstrong's Works during February were:-Nos. 3085, 63141, 77111/52, 77218, 77378, 77401, 79219; while those ex Works during the same period were:-Nos. 70817, 77001, 77115, 77221, 77310, 78542, 79264, 90685 (ex 79224). SLS/194904

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/03/1941 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3085
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to St Margarets (STM)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
02/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97)
   
20/08/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
18/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1945. Dep: 12/10/1945.    
31/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945.    
27/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945.    
02/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/03/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946.    
22/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4975    
16/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
04/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1948. Dep: 17/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27553 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64975
   
05/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/12/1951. Dep: 28/12/1951.    
15/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1954. Dep: 08/08/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27556 (Diagram 97)
   
19/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/07/1955. Dep: 26/08/1955.    
12/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/11/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955.    
13/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
04/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1959. Dep: 24/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 25805 (Diagram 97)
   
06/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1959. Dep: 25/11/1959.    
29/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64975 from Dawsholm (65D)    

prev prev