|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 20/02/1944 | 02/04/1944 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8005 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1945 | 03/11/1945 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 2945 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1948 | 26/04/1948 | 61 days | Heavy | Renumbered to BR 64976 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1948 | 24/12/1948 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 3175 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 14/11/1952 | 04/02/1952 | -283 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 27/07/1954 | 10/09/1954 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27823 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1955 | 08/10/1955 | 66 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1955 | 19/10/1955 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1956 | 17/11/1956 | 47 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 15/07/1957 | 07/09/1957 | 55 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 27830 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/09/1957 | 19/09/1957 | 7 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/10/1958 | Colwich MPD - stored locomotives | 63729, 63839, 63614, 64976/88, 61739/52/3/4/80, 90005/25/53/288; J50s are going into store as new diesel shunters arrive (D3624/5/6/7 have arrived). | SLS/195811 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/03/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3086 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1854 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
30/03/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
20/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1944. Dep: 02/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8005 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2945 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4976 | ||
22/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
26/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/02/1948. Dep: 26/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64976 |
||
18/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1948. Dep: 24/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3175 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/02/1952 | Modification | Diagram 97 number 27807 boiler fitted | ||
27/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
14/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1952. Dep: 04/02/1952. | ||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
27/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1954. Dep: 10/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27823 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
04/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 04/08/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955. | ||
10/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/10/1955. Dep: 19/10/1955. | ||
02/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/10/1956. Dep: 17/11/1956. | ||
15/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/07/1957. Dep: 07/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27830 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1957. Dep: 19/09/1957. | ||
25/11/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64976 from Colwick (40E) | ||
03/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |