|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/04/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 60 days | General | Boiler number E1356 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1945 | 23/05/1945 | 100 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1947 | 11/06/1947 | 135 days | General | Boiler number 2093 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1947 | 06/07/1947 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 26/11/1950 | 30/01/1951 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 27653 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64979 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1953 | 30/01/1954 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27830 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1954 | 06/04/1954 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1954 | 12/04/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1957 | 10/08/1957 | 52 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27833 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1950 | Derby Works | In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed. Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal. |
SLS/195101 |
31/01/1951 | Derby Works | During the second half of January new construction comprised some work on Nos. 73000/1, the cylinders of the former being positioned. No. 10100 has been outside the diesel shop for some days. Condemned locos. in the Works yard: 40370, 41012, 41824 (from W.R.), also the N.L. Crane 58865. No. 22853 was still in Works, not cut up, on 26/1. In store near the station: 43429 (17C), and 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361 (17A), all 17A. Engines from other Regions under repair: 42328, 42506/23, 58043 (33A), 42394 (87K), 44518 (35C), 64728 (40A), 64751, 64911 (37A), 64987 (36C). Most engines now leave shops with the B.R. emblem, but 42371 an 47473 have come off lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS, while tenders so lettered are attached to 43757, 44576 an 58265. Engines off shops with tanks or tenders lettered L.M.S. are 42335, 41101, 43395, 44002/15: apparently Derby has a lingering affection for this lettering, which became obsolete three years ago!! W2043 has come off without emblem, but with W prefix under the numberplate. No. 58071, lined with emblem, is freshly out still with round-topped firebox. Several J.39 class have come off shops, 64793, 64910/79 (repainted with emblem) and 64714 (renumbered-with emblem-but not repainted). Un-renumbered engines in shops include 326 (20A), 580 (27D), 7295 (12A), 7339 (11A), 7391 (12A). No. 326 is the last of the S. & D.J. engines to get its B.R. number, which will be its fourth: originally No. 69, it became 43 in 1928, and 326 in March 1930. Latterly it has been working in the Leeds area. | SLS/195103 |
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/05/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3089 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1857 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
11/05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
09/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
13/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
08/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
26/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number E1356 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1945. Dep: 23/05/1945. | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4979 | ||
28/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1947. Dep: 11/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2093 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1947. Dep: 06/07/1947. | ||
26/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1950. Dep: 30/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27653 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64979 |
||
13/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1953. Dep: 30/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27830 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/03/1954. Dep: 06/04/1954. | ||
11/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1954. Dep: 12/04/1954. | ||
20/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1957. Dep: 10/08/1957. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27833 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
05/01/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64979 from West Auckland (51F) | ||
03/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |