|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/05/1944 | 08/07/1944 | 63 days | General | Boiler number BP134 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 123 days | General | Boiler number 8592 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4983 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1948 | 02/10/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 2104 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64983 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1949 | 11/02/1950 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 4929 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1950 | 23/02/1950 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1953 | 28/03/1953 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 27737 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1953 | 15/04/1953 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1954 | 10/09/1954 | 101 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1955 | 20/10/1955 | 66 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1955 | 26/10/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1956 | 15/09/1956 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 27879 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/06/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3093 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1861 Allocated to Grantham (GRA) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
26/07/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
08/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1944. Dep: 08/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP134 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8592 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4983 |
||
16/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1948. Dep: 02/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2104 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64983 |
||
07/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1949. Dep: 11/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4929 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1950. Dep: 23/02/1950. | ||
13/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1953. Dep: 28/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27737 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1953. Dep: 15/04/1953. | ||
02/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1954. Dep: 10/09/1954. | ||
16/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/08/1955. Dep: 20/10/1955. | ||
24/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/10/1955. Dep: 26/10/1955. | ||
29/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1956. Dep: 15/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27879 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
10/11/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64983 from Colwick (40E) |