Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 152 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 152 Week
» 18934 Month
» 267227 Year
» 1151608 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3095   03/07/1941
LNER (1946) 4985   20/10/1946
BR 64985   16/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Thu 03/07/1941 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Thu 31/12/1959 off Cambridge (31A)
Scrapping During 01/1960
Service Life 18 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Stratford

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) 03/07/1941
BOS Boston 30/07/1941
CLK Colwick 08/10/1941
ARD Ardsley 18/08/1946
30A Stratford 22/09/1952
30F Parkeston Quay 27/11/1955
35A New England 28/10/1956
35C Spital Bridge 14/04/1957
31A Cambridge 08/06/1958
   Withdrawn 31/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   31/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/07/1941 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3195)
19/08/1944 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3193)
04/03/1950 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 3201)
16/04/1955 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27433)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 31/05/1944 19/08/1944 81 days General
Boiler number 3193 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1946 03/08/1946 96 days General  
Gorton Works 17/08/1948 16/10/1948 61 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 64985
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1950 04/03/1950 47 days General
Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1950 12/03/1950 3 days Unclassified  
Derby Works 23/06/1952 20/08/1952 59 days General  
Derby Works 25/08/1952 05/09/1952 12 days Unclassified  
Stratford Works 07/03/1955 16/04/1955 41 days General
Boiler number 27433 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/07/1941 To Service To service as LNER Number 3095
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
30/07/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (BOS)    
08/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
31/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3193 (Diagram 97)
   
30/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946.    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4985    
17/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/08/1948. Dep: 16/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64985
   
17/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1950. Dep: 04/03/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 97)
   
10/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1950. Dep: 12/03/1950.    
23/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1952. Dep: 20/08/1952.    
25/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/08/1952. Dep: 05/09/1952.    
22/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
07/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1955. Dep: 16/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27433 (Diagram 97)
   
27/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
28/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
14/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
08/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
31/12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64985 from Cambridge (31A)    

prev prev