|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 03/01/1943 | 18/02/1943 | 47 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/08/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 2719 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/08/1949 | 17/09/1949 | 31 days | General | Renumbered to BR 64986 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/03/1950 | 17/03/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/03/1952 | 05/05/1952 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 27557 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/03/1955 | 30/03/1955 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/04/1955 | 14/04/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/06/1956 | 23/06/1956 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/02/1958 | 29/03/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27547 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/12/1961 | 09/01/1962 | 19 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
27/08/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. | SLS/194910 |
12/06/1963 | Inverurie Works (Awaiting scrapping or shopping) | In Works: 42273, 45176, 61076, 61103, D8032. Shopped in four weeks ending 7th June : 64588, D362, D6155, 44960, 65930, 61404. Scrapped in same period: 64581, 65217/57/304, 64822, 65928; 64499, 65237. Being scrapped: 57617/31, 68346, 90077/575. Awaiting scrapping or shopping-64599/600, 64795, 64950/86. 64946 was waiting at Kittybrewster. | SLS/196307 |
20/07/1963 | Inverurie Works (Scrapped) | Shopped during six weeks ended 20th July: 42273, 45176, 61076/346/402, 64549, 65267/323/908/22/6, D5340, D6140/5/6. Scrapped in same period-57607, 64795/946/86, 65261, 67668, 68445/79. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/07/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3096 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1864 Allocated to St Margarets (STM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
03/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1943. Dep: 18/02/1943. | ||
20/08/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hawick (HAW) | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4986 | ||
19/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2719 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
21/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
22/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
27/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
18/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1949. Dep: 17/09/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64986 |
||
10/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/03/1950. Dep: 17/03/1950. | ||
17/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1952. Dep: 05/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27557 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/03/1955. Dep: 30/03/1955. | ||
13/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1955. Dep: 14/04/1955. | ||
01/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/06/1956. Dep: 23/06/1956. | ||
27/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1958. Dep: 29/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27547 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/08/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
18/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
22/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/12/1961. Dep: 09/01/1962. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64986 from Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |