|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/02/1945 | 05/05/1945 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 27714 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/03/1948 | 17/05/1948 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 2926 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64987 |
||
Derby Works | 20/01/1951 | 12/03/1951 | 52 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 24/01/1952 | 07/03/1952 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27805 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 18/03/1952 | 01/04/1952 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 14/08/1954 | 24/09/1954 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27889 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1957 | 25/07/1957 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27687 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1957 | 16/08/1957 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1958 | 20/09/1958 | 13 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1951 | Derby Works | During the second half of January new construction comprised some work on Nos. 73000/1, the cylinders of the former being positioned. No. 10100 has been outside the diesel shop for some days. Condemned locos. in the Works yard: 40370, 41012, 41824 (from W.R.), also the N.L. Crane 58865. No. 22853 was still in Works, not cut up, on 26/1. In store near the station: 43429 (17C), and 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361 (17A), all 17A. Engines from other Regions under repair: 42328, 42506/23, 58043 (33A), 42394 (87K), 44518 (35C), 64728 (40A), 64751, 64911 (37A), 64987 (36C). Most engines now leave shops with the B.R. emblem, but 42371 an 47473 have come off lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS, while tenders so lettered are attached to 43757, 44576 an 58265. Engines off shops with tanks or tenders lettered L.M.S. are 42335, 41101, 43395, 44002/15: apparently Derby has a lingering affection for this lettering, which became obsolete three years ago!! W2043 has come off without emblem, but with W prefix under the numberplate. No. 58071, lined with emblem, is freshly out still with round-topped firebox. Several J.39 class have come off shops, 64793, 64910/79 (repainted with emblem) and 64714 (renumbered-with emblem-but not repainted). Un-renumbered engines in shops include 326 (20A), 580 (27D), 7295 (12A), 7339 (11A), 7391 (12A). No. 326 is the last of the S. & D.J. engines to get its B.R. number, which will be its fourth: originally No. 69, it became 43 in 1928, and 326 in March 1930. Latterly it has been working in the Leeds area. | SLS/195103 |
07/03/1951 | Derby Works | Early March-Un-renumbered engines entering works were 1396 (19B), 3186 (21C), 3991 (17B), 7334 (20D), 7346 (9B), 7508 (25E), 7605 (11A). For special examination 43232 (15C). From other regions 42507/24 (33A), 64713 an 64909 (36A), 64828 (38A). New construction: 73000 had boiler on 9/3, 73002/3 an 12088/9 were frames only. Additional stored engines are 404 an 43496. Engines from other regions, repainted with emblem-2183, 64907/87. Off Works lettered L.M.S.-10000, 40430, 43995/7. | SLS/195108 |
14/03/1951 | Derby Works | Early March-Un-renumbered engines entering works were 1396 (19B), 3186 (21C), 3991 (17B), 7334 (20D), 7346 (9B), 7508 (25E), 7605 (11A). For special examination 43232 (15C). From other regions 42507/24 (33A), 64713 an 64909 (36A), 64828 (38A). New construction: 73000 had boiler on 9/3: 73002/3 an 12088/9 were frames only. Additional stored engines are 404 an 43496. Engines from other regions, repainted with emblem-2183, 64907/87. Off Works lettered L.M.S.-10000, 40430, 43995/7. | SLS/195104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/08/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3097 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1865 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
18/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
29/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
26/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1945. Dep: 05/05/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27714 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4987 | ||
28/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
21/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1948. Dep: 17/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2926 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64987 |
||
20/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/01/1951. Dep: 12/03/1951. | ||
24/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1952. Dep: 07/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27805 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/03/1952. Dep: 01/04/1952. | ||
17/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
14/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1954. Dep: 24/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27889 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1957. Dep: 25/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27687 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/07/1957. Dep: 16/08/1957. | ||
08/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/09/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958. | ||
15/03/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64987 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
04/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |