Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 130 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17933 Week
» 70949 Month
» 190476 Year
» 3217329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
162 |
m/e |
02/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3162 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1945) |
3185 |
m/e |
06/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8895 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68895 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 162 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1421 Allocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3162 |
|
|
06/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3185 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8895 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68895 |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
28/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68895 |
|
|