Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 30 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1702 Week
» 20023 Month
» 108215 Year
» 992596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 166 m/e 03/1914
LNER (1924) 3166 m/e 12/1925
LNER (1945) 3188 m/e 06/1945
LNER (1946) 8898 m/e 11/1946
BR 68898 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class J50
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J5103/1914
J50/111/1929
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 276
Works Number 1423
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 03/1914 to Ardsley (ARD)
Withdrawal During 01/1960
Service Life 45 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ARD Ardsley (New) m/e 03/1914
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
56B Ardsley 4w/e 21/09/1957
51A Darlington 5w/e 14/06/1958
56A Wakefield w/e 20/06/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 11/07/1959
WDN   04/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1914 To Service To service as GNR Number 166
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1423
Allocated to Ardsley (ARD)
   
12/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 3166    
06/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 3188    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8898    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 68898    
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 68898    

prev prev