Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 836 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 836 Week
» 21818 Month
» 163772 Year
» 1048153 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 176 m/e 06/1915
LNER (1924) 3176 m/e 04/1926
LNER (1946) 8908 m/e 07/1946
BR 68908 w/e 18/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J50
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J51/206/1915
J50/209/1929
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 280
Works Number 1464
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 06/1915 to Ardsley (ARD)
Withdrawal During 09/1963
Service Life 48 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ARD Ardsley (New) m/e 06/1915
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
56F Low Moor 4w/e 08/02/1958
51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 10/05/1958
51L Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
56F Low Moor w/e 31/01/1959
56A Wakefield w/e 29/12/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   23/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1915 To Service To service as GNR Number 176
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1464
Allocated to Ardsley (ARD)
   
04/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 3176    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8908    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68908    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
29/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 68908    

prev prev