Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
178 |
m/e |
06/1915 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3178 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8909 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
68909 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
280 |
Works Number |
1465 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1915 to Ardsley (ARD) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/04/1960 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51E |
Stockton |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
5w/e |
04/10/1958 |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/04/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1915 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 178 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1465 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3178 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8909 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68909 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockton (51E) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
04/04/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68909 |
|
|