Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4395 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13969 Week
» 78923 Month
» 281587 Year
» 3308440 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
211 |
m/e |
06/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3211 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8910 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68910 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
289 |
Works Number |
1492 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1919 to Ardsley (ARD) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 26/11/1962 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 211 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1492 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3211 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8910 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68910 |
|
|
28/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
26/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68910 |
|
|