Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17937 Week
» 70953 Month
» 190480 Year
» 3217333 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
218 |
m/e |
08/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3218 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8917 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68917 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Departmental |
12 |
m/e |
09/1962 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
289 |
Works Number |
1499 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1919 to Ardsley (ARD) |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1965 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DON |
Doncaster |
w/e |
04/12/1948 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 218 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1499 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3218 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8917 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68917 |
|
|
04/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
09/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12 |
|
|
05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12 |
|
|