Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 836 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 836 Week
» 21818 Month
» 163772 Year
» 1048153 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 219 m/e 08/1919
LNER (1924) 3219 m/e 11/1925
LNER (1946) 8918 m/e 27/01/1946
BR 68918 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J51
Company History GNR/LNER/BR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J51/208/1919
J50/204/1930
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 289
Works Number 1500
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 08/1919 to Ardsley (ARD)
Withdrawal During 07/1961
Service Life 41 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ARD Ardsley (New) m/e 08/1919
DON Doncaster 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34B Hornsey 4w/e 18/10/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1961
34A Kings Cross w/e 15/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 04/10/1952
WDN   20/07/1961
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 05/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1919 To Service To service as GNR Number 219
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1500
Allocated to Ardsley (ARD)
   
11/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 3219    
01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8918    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68918    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 68918    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    

prev prev