Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2947 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16353 Week
» 69369 Month
» 188896 Year
» 3215749 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
219 |
m/e |
08/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3219 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8918 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
British Railways |
68918 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
289 |
Works Number |
1500 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1919 to Ardsley (ARD) |
Withdrawal |
Thu 20/07/1961 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/07/1961 |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 219 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1500 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3219 |
|
|
27/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8918 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68918 |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
20/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68918 |
|
|