Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
221 |
m/e |
10/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3221 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8920 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
68920 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
296 |
Works Number |
1544 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1922 to Ardsley (ARD) |
Withdrawal |
Thu 20/07/1961 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/07/1961 |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 221 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1544 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3221 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8920 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Woodford Halse (WFD) |
|
|
25/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68920 |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
20/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68920 |
|
|