Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1336 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19139 Week
» 72155 Month
» 191682 Year
» 3218535 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
225 |
m/e |
11/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3225 |
m/e |
09/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8924 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68924 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
296 |
Works Number |
1548 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1922 to Ardsley (ARD) |
Withdrawal |
Tue 14/02/1961 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 3 mths , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
9w/e |
31/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
16/04/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/02/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1961 |
Stratford Works (waiting cut-up) |
Steam locomotives-Old Works: 68633; waiting cut-up 67726, 68924; foundry 68612, 69690 |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 225 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1548 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
09/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3225 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8924 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68924 |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
14/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68924 |
|
|