Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 61 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 61 Week
» 18382 Month
» 106574 Year
» 990955 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 226   12/1922
LNER (1924) 3226   07/1926
LNER (1946) 8925   06/1946
BR 68925 w/e 02/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class J50
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 296
Works Number 1549
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 12/1922 to Ardsley (ARD)
Withdrawal w/e Mon 18/03/1963
Service Life 40 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ARD Ardsley (New) 12/1922
ARD Ardsley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn w/e 18/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC COP Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 24/04/1948
WDN   18/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1922 To Service To service as GNR Number 226
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1549
Allocated to Ardsley (ARD)
   
07/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 3226    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8925    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD)    
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68925    
18/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 68925    

prev prev