Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 864 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18667 Week
» 71683 Month
» 191210 Year
» 3218063 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
227 |
m/e |
12/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3227 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8926 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68926 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
296 |
Works Number |
1550 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1922 to Ardsley (ARD) |
Withdrawal |
Tue 13/02/1962 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 227 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1550 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3227 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8926 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68926 |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
13/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68926 |
|
|