|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1948 | Doncaster Works | 'A.2' No. E527 Sun Chariot was ready for trial at the end of January last and No. E528 Tudor Minstrel was ready for trial on 6/2, when Nos. E529 and E530 were well in hand. 'A.4' No. 21 Wild Swan, 'A.3' No. 112 St. Simon, 'J.50' No. 8929, and several 'V.2's' have appeared with the prefix 'E' and lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS.' | SLS/194803 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1922 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 230 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1553 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
||
02/1926 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3230 | ||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8929 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN) | ||
04/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68929 | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) | ||
15/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) | ||
02/05/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68929 |