Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 324 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18127 Week
» 71143 Month
» 190670 Year
» 3217523 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3236 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8935 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
British Railways |
68935 |
m/e |
05/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
300 |
Works Number |
1591 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/09/1963 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1924 |
ANN |
|
Annesley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
37A |
|
Ardsley |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
37A |
|
Ardsley |
4w/e |
18/10/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/09/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
ALLOC |
37A |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/09/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/04/1951 |
Southend Line |
Owing to turntable repairs at Liverpool Street, there were no reasonable facilities for turning the B1 and B12 class engines which normally work the Southend trains. Since the Date: w/e 7th April, the service has been almost entirely worked by A5 engines transferred from Norwich and the North Eastern Region. Engines observed since this arrangement started are 68932/5/7/8/40/2. On occasions, these engines have not distinguished themselves, and N7 Tanks have had to take over at least twice. 69704 was observed running very fast with the 9.58 up on Saturday 21st April. No doubt, part of the difficulties being experienced with these engines are due to the crews having little knowledge of this type. Also, with the serious shortage of footplate men, young lads of 15-16 years of age, are often called out to fire these big machines. |
SLS/195106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3236 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1591 |
|
|
27/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8935 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
28/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
05/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68935 |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
23/09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68935 |
|
|