Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3899 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22810 Week
» 87764 Month
» 290428 Year
» 3317281 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
591 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8944 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
68944 |
m/e |
07/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
306 |
Works Number |
1641 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 17/09/1960 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 591 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1641 |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8944 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
28/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
09/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C) |
|
|
07/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68944 |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68944 |
|
|