Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 327 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14370 Week
» 79324 Month
» 281988 Year
» 3308841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
603 |
m/e |
06/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8949 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68949 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
306 |
Works Number |
1646 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 14/04/1959 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34E |
Neasden |
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/04/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/12/1951 |
Trials on the G.N. |
Recently Diesel No. 15004 and J50 No. 68949 were tried out on test trains from Ferme Park to the S.Rly. via the Widened Lines. It is believed that the J50 (which had been altered to confirm to the smaller loading gauge) put up the better performance and in addition had the advantage of not having to be turned between trips. The Diesel for some reason was only used running forwards. |
SLS/195203 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 603 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1646 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8949 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68949 |
|
|
02/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
14/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68949 |
|
|