Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 906 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1806 Week
» 13627 Month
» 182399 Year
» 1066780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 609 m/e 08/1926
LNER (1946) 8950 m/e 04/1946
BR 68950 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J50
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 307
Works Number 1647
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 08/1926
Withdrawal Sat 23/09/1961
Service Life 35 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40B Immingham 4w/e 18/02/1956
38A Colwick m/e 21/07/1956
34B Hornsey w/e 20/02/1960
34A Kings Cross w/e 15/07/1961
   Withdrawn 23/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford 9w/e 31/03/1946
LOAN 14A Cricklewood East w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   23/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1926 To Service To service as LNER Number 609
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1647
   
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8950    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68950    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
21/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 68950    

prev prev