Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 616 m/e 08/1926
LNER (1946) 8952 m/e 04/1946
BR 68952 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J50
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 307
Works Number 1649
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 08/1926
Withdrawal During 08/1960
Service Life 34 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65A Eastfield 4w/e 26/01/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STM St Margarets 4w/e 23/03/1946
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 26/01/1952
WDN   17/08/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1926 To Service To service as LNER Number 616
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1649
   
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8952    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68952    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 68952    

prev prev