Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 755 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14161 Week
» 67177 Month
» 186704 Year
» 3213557 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
617 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8953 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
68953 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
307 |
Works Number |
1650 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 24/07/1959 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1926 |
EFD |
|
Eastfield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
66A |
|
Polmadie |
4w/e |
11/05/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/07/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/07/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 617 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1650 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8953 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68953 |
|
|
11/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
24/07/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68953 |
|
|