Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3516 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16922 Week
» 69938 Month
» 189465 Year
» 3216318 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1037 |
m/e |
11/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8959 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
British Railways |
68959 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
308 |
Works Number |
1656 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 31/08/1961 |
Service Life |
34 yrs , 10 mths |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
56B |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
ALLOC |
51F |
West Auckland |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
4w/e |
24/01/1959 |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
08/08/1959 |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
14/05/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
31/08/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1947 |
Darlington Works |
New 'Bl' Class loco. No. 1034 is named Chiru, and Nos. 1035-1039 have had the following names allotted to them:-Pronghorn, Korngum, Jairou, Blacktail, and Steinbok respectively. |
SLS/194711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1037 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1656 |
|
|
27/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8959 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68959 |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
24/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
31/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68959 |
|
|