Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1041 m/e 11/1926
LNER (1946) 8960 m/e 20/01/1946
BR 68960 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J50
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 308
Works Number 1657
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 11/1926
Withdrawal During 07/1961
Service Life 34 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ARD Ardsley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
36A Doncaster 4w/e 21/10/1950
36C Frodingham 4w/e 19/05/1951
36A Doncaster 4w/e 19/07/1958
34B Hornsey 5w/e 15/11/1958
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1961
34A Kings Cross w/e 15/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 04/12/1948
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 16/10/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham w/e 05/05/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 14/07/1958
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 01/11/1958
WDN   25/07/1961
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 05/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1926 To Service To service as LNER Number 1041
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1657
   
01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8960    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68960    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 68960    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    

prev prev