Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 767 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14173 Week
» 67189 Month
» 186716 Year
» 3213569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1068 |
m/e |
12/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8964 |
m/e |
01/1946 |
British Railways |
68964 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
308 |
Works Number |
1661 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 01/10/1962 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
LOAN |
91NE |
|
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
LOAN |
56B |
Ardsley |
5w/e |
12/08/1961 |
ALLOC |
91NE |
|
4w/e |
02/09/1961 |
ALLOC |
56B |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
09/09/1961 |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
5w/e |
03/02/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1068 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1661 |
|
|
01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8964 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Frodingham (FRO) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68964 |
|
|
31/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
29/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
19/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
13/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
01/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68964 |
|
|