Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1526 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19329 Week
» 72345 Month
» 191872 Year
» 3218725 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1070 |
m/e |
12/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8966 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
68966 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
308 |
Works Number |
1663 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/08/1961 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1926 |
ARD |
|
Ardsley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34B |
|
Hornsey |
5w/e |
24/03/1956 |
34A |
|
Kings Cross |
w/e |
15/07/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/08/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
5w/e |
31/03/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/08/1961 |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1070 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1663 |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8966 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68966 |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
01/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68966 |
|
|