Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3012 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16418 Week
» 69434 Month
» 188961 Year
» 3215814 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1079 |
m/e |
01/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8968 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
British Railways |
68968 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
308 |
Works Number |
1665 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 26/04/1961 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 3 mths , 26 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1927 |
FRO |
|
Frodingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34B |
|
Hornsey |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
34B |
|
Hornsey |
4w/e |
15/11/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/04/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
FRO |
Frodingham |
w/e |
28/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/04/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/11/1953 |
Darlington Works |
North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. |
SLS/195402 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1079 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1665 |
|
|
27/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8968 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Frodingham (FRO) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68968 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
26/04/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68968 |
|
|