Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1033 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18836 Week
» 71852 Month
» 191379 Year
» 3218232 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1081 |
m/e |
03/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8969 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
British Railways |
68969 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
309 |
Works Number |
1666 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/02/1960 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/02/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1081 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1666 |
|
|
27/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8969 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68969 |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
22/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68969 |
|
|