Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 902 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1802 Week
» 13623 Month
» 182395 Year
» 1066776 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2789 m/e 03/1930
LNER (1946) 8972 m/e 24/03/1946
BR 68972 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J50
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 318
Works Number 1732
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1930
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Service Life 32 yrs, 6 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34B Hornsey 4w/e 18/10/1952
36A Doncaster w/e 15/07/1961
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 06/03/1948
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2789
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1732
   
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8972    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68972    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 68972    

prev prev